Financial history PINHOE COMMUNITY CENTRE - AMERICA HALL

Charity Number: 300926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024 31/03/2025
Total gross income £44.51k £47.01k £52.84k £65.52k £59.33k
Total expenditure £44.47k £43.62k £63.10k £65.39k £58.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £31.00k £5.43k £5.00k N/A N/A