Financial history PARISH HALL- SANDFORD

Charity number: 300958
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.52k £22.74k £17.85k £22.12k £23.13k
Total expenditure £7.78k £5.49k £43.99k £26.27k £18.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.57k £10.67k N/A N/A