PARISH HALL- SANDFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sandford Parish Hall is a large hall situated in Mid Devon. The Hall is used regularly by Playgroup, Toddlers, WI, Good Companions and Brownies. Other users are Creedy Dramatic Society, Sandford School, Sandford Scout Organisation. There are also vaious classes held on a weekly basis in the Hall, these include dancing and yoga classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 30 July 1962: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL - SANDFORD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MIKE SNOW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christopher Theedom | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL VOWLES | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shuana Lynn Miles | Trustee | 28 May 2015 |
|
|||||
ROSIE CHERITON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.52k | £22.74k | £17.85k | £22.12k | £23.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.78k | £5.49k | £43.99k | £26.27k | £18.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.57k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 25TH MAY 1948 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 8TH NOVEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF SANDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Orchard Close
Sandford
CREDITON
Devon
EX17 4NF
- Phone:
- 01363772696
- Email:
- Cheriton@farmline.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window