SHALDON AND RINGMORE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide grants to assist in the education of persons under the age of 25 who reside in the villages of Shaldon and Ringmore, Devon.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Devon
Governance
- 01 April 1971: Standard registration
- SHALDON AND RINGMORE VILLAGE HALL TRUST (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR JON BROOKS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Brian James Hamblin | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MRS F M COMMANDER | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANNE ROSEMARY MEARS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.40k | £4.95k | £5.46k | £5.28k | £5.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.81k | £5.10k | £5.03k | £5.50k | £3.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEMES OF THE 10/11/59, 11/12/82, 15/11/85 AND 10 JUNE 2002
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (I) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (II) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. (B) THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
SHALDON AND RINGMORE
Contact information
- Address:
-
LA JOLLA
DUNMORE DRIVE
SHALDON
TEIGNMOUTH
TQ14 0BJ
- Phone:
- 01626873999
- Email:
- francescommander@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window