Financial history SHEBBEAR VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS

Charity number: 300962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £12.42k £19.56k £13.78k £18.77k £12.57k
Total expenditure £12.65k £16.15k £15.47k £27.93k £11.77k
Income from government contracts N/A £200 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.10k £10.30k £3.00k £200