Trustees SHEBBEAR VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS
Charity number: 300962

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Greig Hayes | Chair | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Taylor-Mildenhall | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon George Young | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Lee | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Sarah Lee | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tom William Charles Douglas | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Rosemary Young | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Ashton | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.