SIDFORD SOCIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve the conditions of life of the inhabitants of the area by the provision of a village hall for use by the inhabitants, including use for meetings, lectures and classes and other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 07 July 1962: Standard registration
- SIDFORD SOCIAL HALL (Working name)
- SIDFORD PUBLIC HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter David EAGLES | Chair | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Bruce-Gormley | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Baker | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kath Baker | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Patricia Hewitt | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diana June Chamberlen | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Hewitt | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Chamberlen | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Elaine EAGLES | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN POOLE | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JENNY SHEARER | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jean Frewin | Trustee | 12 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
NICK BEAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAN BEAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.42k | £8.29k | £8.95k | £16.47k | £31.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.29k | £11.98k | £9.51k | £11.70k | £14.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 March 2023 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 January 2022 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 7TH APRIL 2003 as amended on 28 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
SIDFORD DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sidford Social Hall
Byes Lane
Sidford
SIDMOUTH
Devon
EX10 9QX
- Phone:
- 01395516060
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window