Financial history SOUTHLEIGH PARISH HALL

Charity number: 300971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/09/2020 09/09/2021 09/09/2022 09/09/2023 09/09/2024
Total gross income £11.57k £6.34k £8.24k £11.99k £4.48k
Total expenditure £3.86k £1.88k £16.75k £9.40k £3.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £270 N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A