Stockland Victory Hall

Charity number: 300977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

education/training; arts/culture; sports/recreation; animals; economic/community development; employment; children/young people; other charities/voluntary bodies; general public; mankind

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £33,197
Total expenditure: £31,380

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 May 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • STOCKLAND VICTORY HALL (Working name)
  • STOCKLAND VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
  • VICTORY HALL (Working name)
  • VICTORY HALL-STOCKLAND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SHIRLEY ANN WILLIAMS Trustee 01 April 2025
STOCKLAND PARISH LANDS (GENERAL) CHARITY
Received: On time
STOCKLAND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS STOCKLAND
Received: On time
Samantha Robson Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
JENNA PARRIS Trustee 11 November 2024
STOCKLAND AND YARCOMBE PRE-SCHOOL
Received: 59 days late
LUCY ANN DURRANT Trustee 12 March 2024
None on record
NIGEL PARRIS Trustee 14 November 2023
None on record
JUSTIN NUTTALL Trustee 12 September 2023
HONITON RFC LIMITED
Recently registered
SARAH BERNHARDT Trustee 08 March 2022
None on record
CLAIRE NUTTALL Trustee 08 March 2022
None on record
WILLIAM GRAHAM GILMOUR-WHITE Trustee 15 November 2016
None on record
ROBERT MILLINGTON Trustee 12 January 2016
None on record
KELLY ANGELA PATCH Trustee 07 November 2015
None on record
LEONORA ALLEN Trustee 03 March 2015
THE FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS STOCKLAND
Received: On time
MRS JENNIFER ANN WHITLEY Trustee 03 March 2015
None on record
MICHAEL DAVID SARSFIELD Trustee 25 July 2011
None on record
PATRICIA BEATRICE BASS Trustee
None on record
JANE YATES Trustee
None on record
TRACEY KIM HARVEY Trustee
None on record
MONICA JEAN PARRIS Trustee
STOCKLAND PARISH LANDS (GENERAL) CHARITY
Received: On time
STOCKLAND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £46.94k £29.62k £33.21k £25.19k £33.20k
Total expenditure £34.48k £20.82k £26.27k £49.26k £31.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £17.30k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 08 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 08 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 20 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 12 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 12 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 11 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 29 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Old Orchard
Membury
AXMINSTER
Devon
EX137TJ
Phone:
01404881805