STOKE FLEMING RECREATIONAL AND PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Stoke Fleming, Devon. A playing field containing a football pitch, 5 aside football facilities, a basketball practice court and petanque pistes. Used for public recreation, football matches, petanque club events, and village and other shows for public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 29 October 1962: Standard registration
- PUBLIC RECREATION GROUND AND PLAYING FIELD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Handley | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Johnston | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Duffy | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tim Moseley | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jay Floyd | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Elliot | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Belli | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Harris | Trustee | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £345 | £200 | £0 | £556 | £231 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.58k | £2.16k | £2.52k | £8.49k | £3.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 March 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 24TH JUNE 1952 AS AMENDED 7 APRIL 2010.
Charitable objects
PUBLIC RECREATION GROUND AND PLAYING FIELD.
Area of benefit
STOKE FLEMING AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Little Elm
Lower Contour Road
Kingswear
DARTMOUTH
Devon
TQ6 0AL
- Phone:
- 07776462299
- Email:
- clerk@stokefleming.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window