BARTON ACORN YOUTH, COMMUNITY AND SPORTS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote use of the Centre as a community facility and resource for the social, leisure, and educational interests of all residents of Torbay and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Torbay
Governance
- 03 August 1995: Standard registration
- 28 November 2000: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE ACORN CENTRE (Working name)
- ACORN YOUTH, COMMUNTIY AND SPORTS CENTRE (Previous name)
- BARTON ACORN YOUTH, COMMUNTIY AND SPORTS CENTRE (Previous name)
- THE ACORN YOUTH CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Niel Eades | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Sanson | Trustee | 24 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Ann Caldicott | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.83k | £132.82k | £156.83k | £135.32k | £117.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.15k | £102.24k | £136.97k | £142.49k | £154.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £103.87k | £35.20k | £17.41k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 March 2021 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 March 2021 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION/RULES (OF UNKNOWN DATE OF ADOPTION) AMENDED 6 JANUARY 2004 AND 4 NOVEMBER 2005. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 MAY 2023
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF TORBAY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE BARTON ACORN YOUTH, COMMUNITY AND SPORTS CENTRE, BARTON FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF TORQUAY AND DISTRICT
Linked charities
- 03 August 1995 : Standard registration
- 28 November 2000 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Acorn Youth Community & Sports Cent
Lummaton Cross
TORQUAY
TQ2 8ET
- Phone:
- 01803328819
- Email:
- enquiries@acorncentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window