VILLAGE HALL - WEARE GIFFARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage and maintain all aspects of running the village hall, in order to hire out to local organisations and individuals. Also adhereing to all conditions on our premises licence issued by Torridge District Council.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 30 July 1962: Standard registration
- WEARE GIFFARD VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vanessa Saunders | Chair | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Brinley Richards | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Lorraine Budge | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Edward Waldron | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angus Cushley | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ann Teasdale | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heather Jane Wraith | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Hedden | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Bott | Trustee | 28 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gregory Hedden | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Lees | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.56k | £32.85k | £20.54k | £11.68k | £12.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.36k | £21.74k | £30.00k | £14.50k | £9.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.43k | £20.48k | £12.05k | £1.93k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 359 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 26TH OCTOBER 1946
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF WEARE GIFFARD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Footlands
Weare Giffard
BIDEFORD
Devon
EX39 4QX
- Phone:
- 07876216031
- Email:
- chairWGVH@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window