STEEPLE LANGFORD RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 1069877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Object of the Charity is the provision and maintenance of the Recreation Ground for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Parish of Steeple Langford without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, with the object of improving conditions of life of the said inhabitants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LANGFORD RECREATION GROUND MANAGEMENT TRUSTEES (LRGMT) (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
denis james harkin Chair
LANGFORD COMMUNITY AND SPORTS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
PETER MICHAEL DENNIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 May 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE PAVILION
STEEPLE LANGFORD RECREATION
GROUND THE WIRR
STEEPLE LANGFORD
SALISBURY WILTSHIRE
SP3 4ND
Phone:
07769674197
Website:

No information available