WESTWARD HO COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
"Village Hall" fascilities for local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £14,105 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 01 August 1962: Standard registration
- KINGSLEY COMMUNITY HALL (Working name)
- COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- WESTWARD HO! COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THELMA CLARK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Wright | Trustee | 04 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
LINDA MOUNTJOY | Trustee | 08 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
WENDY HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACKIE SHARROCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.12k | £17.66k | £39.97k | £37.85k | £37.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.83k | £13.77k | £28.12k | £44.75k | £44.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.50k | £6.00k | £21.51k | £750 | £14.11k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 18 January 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 18 January 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 06 June 2023 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 06 June 2023 | 160 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 September 2021 | 275 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 30 September 2021 | 275 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 19 APRIL, 1949 TRUST DEED DATED 19 JANUARY, 1950 AS AMENDED ON 04 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
WESTWARD HO AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Shelties
Park Avenue
Westward Ho!
Devon
EX39 1LP
- Phone:
- 07483 229033
- Email:
- lindakings1949@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window