STUDLAND CHURCH LANDS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish a Fabric Fund to prvide funds to repair,improve St.Nicholas Church Studland and to provide funds for other religious work in the Ecclesiastical Parish of Studland
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
Governance
- 26 June 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD DR IAN NICHOLAS BIRD | Chair | 07 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Diana Jane Edmonds | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|||||
David Hogsflesh | Trustee | 15 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
ERIC STOBART | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ANN MATTHEWS | Trustee | 01 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.15k | £46.00k | £46.64k | £47.98k | £48.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.59k | £35.67k | £30.69k | £72.22k | £70.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 18 JANUARY 1993
Charitable objects
THE TRUST'S INCOME ARISES THROUGH INVESTMENT AND RENTAL INCOME. AFTER APPLYING THE INCOME TO DEFRAY THE COSTS OF MAINTAINING THE TRUST PROPERTY AND COSTS OF ADMINISTRATION THE INCOME IS APPLIED AS FOLLOWS:- 1. THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A FABRIC FUND' BY THE TRANSFER OF SUCH ANNUAL SUM SUFFICIENT FOR THE REPAIR, IMPROVEMENT OR REBUILDING OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST NICHOLAS, STUDLAND. IN SO FAR AS THE FUND IS NOT APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSE FOR WHICH IT WAS ESTABLISHED, ANY SURPLUS WILL BE INVESTED IN THE TRUST. 2. FUNDS IN SO FAR AS THEY CANNOT BE DIRECTED INTO THE FABRIC FUND WILL BE APPLIED FOR THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STUDLAND. ANY FURTHER INCOME NOT SO APPLIED MAY BE PAID BY THE MANAGING TRUSTEES TO THE SALISBURY DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE FOR THE CREATION OF A SEPARATE FUND TO BE APPLIED FOR THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE BENEFICE OF SWANAGE AND STUDLAND.
Area of benefit
SWANAGE AND STUDLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Highfield House
Ferry Road
Studland
Swanage
BH19 3AQ
- Phone:
- 07842242608
- Email:
- dhogs@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window