LEOMINSTER UNDENOMINATIONAL EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The undenominational charity provides grants to local feeder primary schools and Earl Mortimer College & Sixth Form Centre for resources to benefit their entire student body.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 17 April 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Earl Mortimer College | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £295 | £367 | £344 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 548 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 548 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 913 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 913 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1278 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1278 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1643 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1643 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 21 JUNE 1999.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE FOLLOWING SCHOOLS : LEOMINSTER INFANTS SCHOOL; LEOMINSTER JUNIOR SCHOOL; WESTFIELDS SCHOOL; MINSTER COLLEGE; IVINGTON VOLUNTARY AIDED SCHOOL; AND STOKE PRIOR COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
LEOMINSTER, HEREFORDSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Earl Mortimer College & Sixth Form
South Street
LEOMINSTER
HR6 8JJ
- Phone:
- 01568613221
- Email:
- madams@emc.hereford.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window