Trustees 31ST PLYMOUTH (ERNESETTLE) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 301066
Up to date (104 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS DANIEL KINGCOMBE | Chair | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Sarah Jeffs | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chantelle Trevine Howe | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Louise Powell | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Edgecombe | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Yvonne Tanya York | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Richard Edgecombe | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE JAYNE TRELIVING | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Iain James Mitchell | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLEY DOROTHY SKINNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRY DAVID RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEISA IRENE HUSSEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KIM DENISE RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS JENNY CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA JEAN WATTERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR DAVID RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.