DEVON COUNTY GUIDES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 301072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Devon County Guide Association provides opportunities for girls and young women to meet and develop into caring, tolerant and confident people who will contribute positively to the community and the environment both in Devon and the country and the world.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £101,482
Total expenditure: £84,084

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 August 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GIRLGUIDING DEVON (Working name)
  • DEVON COUNTY GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jean langridge Trustee 26 September 2024
None on record
Karen Louise Phillips Trustee 26 September 2024
None on record
Cara Dawn Bennett Trustee 01 January 2024
DAWLISH AND STARCROSS DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES
Received: On time
4TH TEIGNMOUTH SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF OLSP PRIMARY SCHOOL
Received: 18 days late
Laura Jane Warne Trustee 01 January 2024
TAVY DIVISION GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Hannah Richardson Trustee 10 November 2023
PLYMOUTH AND DEVONPORT METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
PLYMOUTH EAST GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Samantha Kathleen Lamble Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Linda Carter Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Wendy June Evans Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Rachael Swain Trustee 04 April 2023
None on record
Elaine Fisher Trustee 21 February 2023
None on record
Julie Jane Simons Trustee 09 October 2022
None on record
Victoria Louise Burton Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
Rachel Kathleen Offerdal Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Sharon June Jones Trustee 03 May 2021
None on record
Sharon Reynolds Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record
Phoebe Marie Stubbington Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
Helen Kingdom Trustee 24 January 2020
None on record
Michelle Smith Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Joanna Elizabeth Shute Trustee 02 September 2019
None on record
Laura Parker Trustee 12 January 2019
OLD PRIORY JUNIOR SCHOOL PTFA
Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days
PLYMPTON DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Sarah Maczugowska Trustee 01 October 2018
TAVY DIVISION GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £101.09k £95.00k £60.33k £43.26k £101.48k
Total expenditure £80.95k £57.68k £49.86k £108.14k £84.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 November 2020 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 November 2020 26 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
21 Firleigh Road
Kingsteignton
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ12 3NH
Phone:
01626361419