4TH TEIGNMOUTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £3,009 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 10 August 1966: Standard registration
- 4TH TEIGNMOUTH BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cara Dawn Bennett | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||||
CLIVE WETTEN | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Josephine Saxton | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
RICHARD NEWTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.54k | £20.96k | £16.62k | £11.92k | £13.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.79k | £2.94k | £7.72k | £9.39k | £10.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | £8.00k | N/A | £3.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955., ASSIGNMENT DATED 18TH AUGUST 1965
Charitable objects
4TH TEIGNMOUTH BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
TEIGNMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Apple Barn Shutterton Lane
Dawlish Warren
Dawlish
Devon
Devon
EX7 0PD
- Phone:
- 07929100673
- Email:
- teignmouthgsl@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window