Accounts and annual returns TEIGNMOUTH DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 301084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 15 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 05 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 11 July 2023 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required