10th Torbay (Babbacombe) Sea Scout Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SOCIAL, SPIRITUAL, PHYSICAL AND MENTAL DEVELOPMENT IN A PROGRESSIVE TRAINING SCHEME WITHIN THE FRAMEWORK OF THE SCOUT MOVEMENT FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WITHIN THE AGES OF 6 TO 25 YEARS OF AGE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Torbay
Governance
- 09 August 1966: Standard registration
- 10TH TORQUAY (BABBACOMBE) SEA SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- 10TH TORQUAY BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Justin Wiggin | Chair | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Bradley | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hallows | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bateman | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Parfitt | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Craig Hayward | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH ANDREW SPALDING | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Nicola Ann Spalding | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Angela Jane Slay | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Willis | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.57k | £37.08k | £57.45k | £32.69k | £37.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.94k | £52.60k | £51.08k | £60.33k | £54.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.57k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 March 2024 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 March 2024 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 2ND MARCH 1966 ON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955. as amended on 09 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
10TH TORQUAY BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
TORQUAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
10th Torbay Sea Scouts
Babbacombe Road
TORQUAY
TQ1 3TA
- Phone:
- 07733106064
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window