1ST NORTH DEVON SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing learning and support for all young persons aged between 6 and 18 years old. Based in the centre of Barnstaple Town, North Devon, the 1st North Devon Scout Group have continued to run successfully for over 100 years. Some of the exciting activities we do include Kayaking, Climbing, Orienteering, nights away/camping as well as supporting projects in the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 08 April 1964: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 September 2011: Re-registered
- 09 September 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 November 2012: Re-registered
- 1ST NORTH DEVON (BARNSTAPLE) SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- 1ST NORTH DEVON SCOUT BOY GROUP (Previous name)
- 1ST NORTH DEVON SCOUT GROUP VICTORIA STREET BARNSTAPLE NORTH DEVON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Chappel | Chair | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Hardy | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Nelson | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lee Rogerson | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bolton | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Lerwill | Trustee | 24 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Dunsworth | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Etheridge | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.61k | £21.33k | £24.07k | £38.85k | £48.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.10k | £18.92k | £22.50k | £40.93k | £49.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £625 | £900 | £1.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04 JAN 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 28 MAR 1949 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 18 FEB 1959 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 05 MAY 1967 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 19 JUL 1991 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 APR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 12 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NORTH DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Cleave Road
Sticklepath
Barnstaple
EX31 2DU
- Phone:
- 01271280188
- Email:
- info@barnstaplescouts.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window