ELY DISTRICT GUIDES

Charity number: 301095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Uniformed organisation for girls and young women - the Ely District supports the work of the volunteer adult leaders in providing a varied programme for the young members

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £8,966
Total expenditure: £10,338

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 February 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GIRLGUIDING ELY CITY DISTRICT (Working name)
  • ELY GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MISS SUE CARPENTER Chair
None on record
Annetta Record Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
REBECCA MARY LEATHERLAND Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
LUCY PARKER Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
DEBORAH ANNE MOULD Trustee 09 September 2017
None on record
ALEXA MARY MINETT Trustee
None on record
JOANNE O'KEEFE Trustee
None on record
MRS PAM CAUSTON Trustee
None on record
MRS JENNY DWIGHT-SMITH Trustee
None on record
BARBARA JEAN KIPPAX Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.32k £9.57k £23.67k £6.95k £8.97k
Total expenditure £7.04k £4.46k £20.59k £7.60k £10.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
63 ELY ROAD
LITTLEPORT
ELY
CB6 1HJ
Phone:
01353 860653
Website:

No information available