VILLAGE HALL BRADFORD ABBAS AND CLIFTON MAYBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provision and maintenance of a Village Hall for the use of residents of the Parishes of Bradford Abbas and Clifton Maybank, including meetings, societies and other recreations, with the object of improving the conditions of life of all residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 10 August 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernard Hunt | Chair | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sue Hanslip | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Hook | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Mitchell | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dave Chapman | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Cox | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Fleming | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE BENNETT | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chris Jones | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.82k | £6.48k | £9.46k | £12.41k | £14.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.46k | £5.22k | £6.98k | £14.92k | £9.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 August 2024 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 27 APRIL 1987
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
BRADFORD ABBAS WITH CLIFTON MAYBANK AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Churchwell Close
Bradford Abbas
Bradford Abbas
Sherborne
Select
- Phone:
- 01935473833
- Email:
- bookings@bavh.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window