Trustees SAVILL MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 301115

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wayne Paul Briggs | Chair | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rose Barker | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Goodall | Trustee | 02 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Ann Bowerman | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Edward Rowland | Trustee | 05 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER HUNT | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SALLY WOOD | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.