DORCHESTER COMMUNITY NURSERY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dorchester Community Nursery School is a pre-school setting offering sessional care extended to offer early starts and lunch club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 24 February 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Newman | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Reeve | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stella Jones | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Wendy Young | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.07k | £143.18k | £143.18k | £1.50m | £173.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.80k | £146.75k | £146.75k | £143.06k | £182.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £95.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.73k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £146.33k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £143.06k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/11/1967 AS AMENDED ON 29/04/1970 AS AMENDED ON 07/07/1971 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/1991 AS AMENDED ON 30/09/1998 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/1999 AS AMENDED ON 12/10/2011 as amended on 16 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO PROVIDE SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN OF DORCHESTER AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
DORCHESTER AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
DORCHESTER COMMUNITY NURSERY SCHOOL
YORK ROAD
DORCHESTER
DT1 1QA
- Phone:
- 01305 265140
- Email:
- Info@dcnsa.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window