Trustees EAST STOUR VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Henry John Seymour Miller Chair 17 April 2018
None on record
Barbara Ann Hall Trustee 22 April 2025
None on record
Tracey Ann Robertson Trustee 30 September 2024
None on record
James Underwood Trustee 02 October 2023
None on record
Sarah Caroline Miller Trustee 27 June 2023
None on record
Gillian Christine Margaret Green Trustee 22 February 2022
None on record
Richard McConnell Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Sheila Rees Trustee 30 April 2019
None on record
Daphne Janet Jones Trustee 17 April 2018
None on record
Hayley Masterton Trustee 03 May 2017
None on record
Sheila Squire Trustee 03 May 2017
None on record
Pamela Isaacs Trustee 14 April 2014
None on record
RODNEY GERALD DOWDING Trustee
None on record
PAULINE MARGARET ROBINSON Trustee
None on record
MARY ELIZABETH DOWDING Trustee
None on record