FRAMPTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of Parish of Frampton and it's immediate vicinity without distiction of political, religious, age colour or other opinions. The hall to be used for leisure, recreational, social and educational functions to improve the life and conditions of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 22 November 1968: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN POOK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Malcolm Potter | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr SALLY TURNER | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steve Westrip | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Tharby | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE GHOSE | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Marie Christopher | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Carole Wendy Jane Irving | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
VICTOR PULLMAN | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
NEIL HAWKINS | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRYAN CLIFFORD WILCOX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.87k | £5.91k | £20.80k | £18.35k | £20.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.62k | £6.94k | £7.55k | £14.70k | £13.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2025 | 359 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 23RD MAY 1983
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF FRAMPTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FRAMPTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHISPERING HEIGHTS
DORCHESTER ROAD
FRAMPTON
DORCHESTER
DORSET
DT2 9NB
- Phone:
- 01300320200
- Email:
- colin.e.pook@gmail.com
- Website:
-
framptonvillagehall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window