Trustees FRAMPTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 301130

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN POOK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Malcolm Potter | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr SALLY TURNER | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steve Westrip | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Tharby | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE GHOSE | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Marie Christopher | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Carole Wendy Jane Irving | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
VICTOR PULLMAN | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
NEIL HAWKINS | Trustee | 04 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRYAN CLIFFORD WILCOX | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.