FERNDOWN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities to local organisations eg badminton-drama, WI T.WG's horticultural society - groups, AA, senior cits, curious arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 07 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE JASPER | Chair | 09 June 2013 |
|
|||||
Isobel Nancy Roche-D'Aubert | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Stanley | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
IAN SCRAGGS | Trustee | 29 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.38k | £28.94k | £48.73k | £63.17k | £56.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.49k | £29.97k | £25.34k | £33.08k | £26.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.01k | N/A | £9.48k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRANSFER AND TRUST DEED DATED 28/02/1934. as amended on 21 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES, CLASSES, RECREATIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HAMPRESTON AND THE DISTRICT OF FERNDOWN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ferndown Village Hall
Church Road
Ferndown
BH22 9ET
- Phone:
- 01202892737
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window