Accounts and annual returns HOLDITCH HALL

Charity number: 301140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 06 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 24 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 17 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 31 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required