Financial history LYTCHETT MATRAVERS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £21.92k £7.27k £19.41k £20.28k £19.17k
Total expenditure £18.67k £13.32k £16.78k £30.81k £28.72k
Income from government contracts £620 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £860 N/A £10.10k N/A N/A