MAPPOWDER VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising with various social/educational events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 11 October 1962: Standard registration
- MAPPOWDER VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- VILLAGE HALL (SALE PROCEEDS) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kay Joan Palmer | Chair | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Howard Sinclair | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Mary Davidson | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David John Horrell | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.51k | £204 | £1.10k | £5.68k | £4.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.79k | £1.44k | £1.06k | £3.96k | £5.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATEED 16 JANUARY 1950 as amended on 27 Apr 2002 as amended on 27 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MAPPOWDER AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
593 Hammond Street
Mappowder
STURMINSTER NEWTON
DT10 2EH
- Phone:
- 01258817063
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window