Financial history MOSTERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 301156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.09k £12.89k £22.95k £11.36k £8.70k
Total expenditure £12.17k £12.63k £6.85k £16.30k £7.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £17.43k £2.67k N/A