Powerstock Hut

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Powerstock Hut Management committee is responsible for the operation of the hut as a local resource available for letting to local people and the adjacent Powerstock C of E School. The committee oversees the maintenance of the hut and keeps accounts for the receipt of income and expenditure on running costs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dorset
Governance
- 01 June 1962: Standard registration
- POWERSTOCK HUT (Working name)
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR JOHN DAVIES | Chair | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Davison | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicholas James Antony Harris | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Joy | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Joy | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Willett | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Whittle | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paula Chidley-Randall | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Randall | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lobb | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL STANBURY | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Crabb | Trustee | 15 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
Heather Pitcher | Trustee | 15 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
JANE WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BOB PITCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.20k | £32.10k | £3.63k | £5.97k | £5.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.58k | £7.98k | £9.44k | £14.77k | £9.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF GIFT DATED 14TH MAY 1953 as amended on 10 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF POWERSTOCK AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kings House
Powerstock
BRIDPORT
Dorset
DT6 3TG
- Phone:
- 01308 485248
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window