Financial history THE JUBILEE HALL

Charity number: 301190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.02k £20.49k £17.41k £4.22k £3.07k
Total expenditure £7.48k £4.88k £9.29k £6.90k £5.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.48k £15.17k N/A N/A