WEST PARLEY MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 301196
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hire the hall to other associations/clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Total income: £19,312
Total expenditure: £26,163
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- Dorset
Governance
Registration history:
- 07 September 1962: Standard registration
- 01 May 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 01 May 2020: Funds transferred to 1179113 WEST PARLEY MEMORIAL HALL CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ...
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
- WAR MEMORIAL VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.17k | £16.00k | £20.70k | £17.60k | £19.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.85k | £20.50k | £20.92k | £16.20k | £26.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.40k | £2.21k | £300 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 15 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 30 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 05 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 15TH JULY 1954
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE PARISH OF WEST PARLEY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window