PAMELA HAMBRO MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This is a village hall charity, providing rooms for clubs, societies and organisations locally to use as a meeting place. We also hire the Hall for social events and special occasions - parties, weddings, Artsreach events, and similar.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 10 September 1962: Standard registration
- P H H (Working name)
- PAMELA HAMBRO HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cheryl Miller | Chair | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Stanley | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Afshari | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stanley | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Llewellyn | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Mitchell | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Robert Batty | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Marchant | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.97k | £21.80k | £17.77k | £8.82k | £8.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.47k | £20.25k | £7.16k | £10.83k | £6.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 1 JULY 1970.
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
WINTERBORNE STICKLAND AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PAMALA HAMBRO HALL
WEST STREET
WINTERBORNE STICKLAND
BLANDFORD FORUM
DT11 0NT
- Phone:
- 01258880740
- Email:
- pamelahambrohall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window