FERNDOWN DISTRICT GUIDES ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 301217
Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity runs guiding activities for girls 5+ years in the Ferndown area of Dorset.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £7,582
Total expenditure: £9,953

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 January 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GIRLGUIDING FERNDOWN DISTRICT (Working name)
  • FERNDOWN DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SALLY WOODLEY Chair 17 October 2021
DORSET GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Kaye Jackson Trustee 09 January 2019
None on record
Karen Tether Trustee 18 September 2018
None on record
Fay Tsalatsanis Trustee 17 September 2018
None on record
MICHELLE RENDELL Trustee 10 September 2018
None on record
EMMA NATALIE GIDDENS Trustee 30 August 2012
None on record
SUE DYER Trustee
None on record
JOAN HOLT Trustee
None on record
KATHLEEN MARGARET BUTLER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £17.58k £30.42k £19.34k £38.10k £7.58k
Total expenditure £35.20k £29.18k £7.14k £23.65k £9.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.10k £10.10k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 April 2024 170 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
59 FITZPAIN ROAD
WEST PARLEY
FERNDOWN
BH22 8RZ
Phone:
01202871803
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available