EAST DORSET DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COORDINATES ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE MEMBERS OF FOURTEEN SCOUT GROUPS UNDER THE DIRECTION OF THE COUNTY ADMINISTRATION FOR THE SCOUTING MOVEMENT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 19 June 1970: Standard registration
- VALE OF ALLEN DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
- WIMBORNE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Godber | Chair | 18 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Richard Caddy | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Danny Cordell | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Mitchell | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trevor James Middleton | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheenagh Dunbar Bradford | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Francis Micklefield | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH FINNEY | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Wragg | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|||||
LINDSAY HUGH CASS | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.07k | £48.14k | £55.65k | £115.40k | £110.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.28k | £41.85k | £50.61k | £95.85k | £126.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
WIMBORNE DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 DAVIDS LANE
RINGWOOD
BH24 2AW
- Phone:
- 150
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window