AYTHORPE RODING VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Meetings lectures and classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving conditions of life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £195 from 1 government contract(s) and £13,744 from 3 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 29 July 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Niki Scripps | Chair | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Anne Betty Coward-Whittaker | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.02k | £2.48k | £492 | £7.89k | £21.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.96k | £3.78k | £896 | £5.89k | £21.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £195 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.74k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 February 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28TH MARCH 1960
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
AYTHORPE RODING AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aythorpe Roding Village Hall
c/o 12 School Villas
The Street
High Roding
Essex
CM6 1NR
- Phone:
- 01279 353350
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window