THE WICKFORD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various Keep Fit classes, Tai Chi, Short Mat Bowls, Ladies Club, Ballroom dancing and afternoon Tea dances, Table Tennis, Fencing, Art and Crafts Club, Parent and Baby Group, Childrens tuition, dance classes and self defence classes. Weightwatchers & Slimming World groups, Bingo social and Members Bar with regular monthly entertainment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 26 January 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VERA BANGS | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Roma Stead | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Day | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Donald Morris | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Wall | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
June Hustwitt | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Clark | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Falkmer | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alex Myers | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steve Clarke | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Major | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carol Hodgson | Trustee | 21 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ADAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.77k | £119.59k | £194.34k | £142.72k | £161.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.38k | £126.46k | £156.24k | £186.37k | £194.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £50.59k | £6.47k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 1ST SEPTEMBER 1966 AS AMENDED 2ND MAY 1989 AS AMENDED 19 OCTOBER 2009.
Charitable objects
TO ROMOTE THE WELL BEING OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA. TO ASSIST IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
WICKFORD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wickford Community Association
The Nevendon Centre
Nevendon Road
WICKFORD
Essex
SS12 0QG
- Phone:
- 01268 732236
- Email:
- admin@wickfordcomc.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window