BLACKMORE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities for the inhabitants of Blackmore for meetings, lectures, classes and other forms of recreation and leisure time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 23 April 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Charles Keeble | Chair | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Caton | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Vincent Blackwell | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.19k | £72.70k | £81.13k | £107.88k | £114.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.24k | £64.51k | £75.59k | £91.57k | £109.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.50k | £12.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21.10.1968
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BLACKMORE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Area of benefit
BLACKMORE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
WILLOWCROFT
POPLAR CLOSE
BLACKMORE
INGATESTONE
CM4 0QJ
- Phone:
- 01277821654
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window