Financial history CLAVERING VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £25.43k £9.15k £22.60k £22.02k £24.18k
Total expenditure £21.38k £5.71k £9.78k £10.51k £16.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.50k N/A £2.67k N/A N/A