Accounts and annual returns COPFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301290
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 03 May 2024 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 01 May 2024 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 01 May 2024 367 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 13 March 2024 683 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required