Financial history COPFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301290
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £16.12k £17.31k £35.78k £16.65k £20.90k
Total expenditure £24.91k £15.32k £23.29k £16.38k £16.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £16.01k N/A N/A