COPFORD VILLAGE HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 16 September 1965: Standard registration
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Copford with Easthorpe Parish Council | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.09k | £16.12k | £17.31k | £35.78k | £16.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.61k | £24.91k | £15.32k | £23.29k | £16.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £16.01k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 May 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 May 2024 | 367 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 01 May 2024 | 367 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 March 2024 | 683 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 17 NOVEMBER 1964 as amended on 22 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF COPFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Copford Village Hall
School Road
Copford
COLCHESTER
CO6 1BX
- Phone:
- 07939 597176
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window