FINCHINGFIELD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides a venue for the following activities: - Pre- School, Carpet Bowls, Pilates, Tai Chi, Zumba, Table Tennis, Horticultural Society, BUDS and Dance classes for Children. Contact point in case of emergencies/disaster in local area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £9,435
Total expenditure: £22,655

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FINCHINGFIELD PARISH COUNCIL Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.54k £14.75k £9.38k £9.04k £9.44k
Total expenditure £8.49k £5.31k £9.87k £9.11k £22.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.50k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 15 NOVEMBER 1947 AND ORDER DATED 27 SEPTEMBER 1957
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FINCHINGFIELD AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Registration history
  • 29 October 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
7 Roach Vale
COLCHESTER
CO4 3YN
Phone:
07810781509