FYFIELD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of a village hall for the use of the local community for running recreational and educational groups/clubs, functions and meeting facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,450 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 03 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah-Jane McGregor | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jones | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karla Ann Hirst | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Barlow | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Ovel | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jean Webster | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephen John Turner | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris Collins | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Mead | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.61k | £16.27k | £41.61k | £39.46k | £38.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.08k | £15.99k | £21.56k | £30.80k | £35.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.19k | £2.67k | £1.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 JUNE 1962. LEASE DATED 16 OCTOBER 1982. as amended on 12 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
FYFIELD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 28 Walker Avenue
Fyfield
ONGAR
Essex
CM5 0RG
- Phone:
- 07956 440894
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window