LITTLE BURSTEAD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

MAINTENANCE OF LOCAL VILLAGE HALL WHICH IS USED FOR LOCAL FUNCTIONS AND GROUP ACTIVITIES I.E. WOMENS INSTITUTE, NCT, SPORTS GROUPS, MUSIC & ART GROUPS ETC. EVENTS ARE ORGANISED THROUGHOUT THE YEAR TO FUND THIS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £16,213
Total expenditure: £11,185

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 February 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER SAVAGE Chair 11 May 2012
None on record
James Slocombe Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
Mr A Hutchings Trustee 09 October 2018
None on record
Mrs J Ellis Trustee 25 October 2017
None on record
Angela McCoy Trustee 25 October 2017
None on record
Mrs C Hutchings Trustee 25 October 2017
None on record
Mrs C Savage Trustee 25 October 2017
None on record
Mrs S Wright Trustee 25 October 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.46k £15.16k £13.47k £11.42k £16.21k
Total expenditure £8.43k £7.15k £10.18k £21.29k £11.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.86k £8.00k £750 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Lawns
Clockhouse Road
Little Burstead
Billericay
CM12 9ST
Phone:
01277627179